judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NAVA VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38346
Short Caption:NAVA VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9904919Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:04/09/2002 at 11:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/09/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/20/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Georgeson Thompson & Angaran, Chtd.--check no. 28903.
08/20/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, and Affidavit of C. James Georgeson in Support of Petition; Exhibits. 01-14086
08/28/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-14559
09/27/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and/or Prohibition. 01-16284
02/25/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 9, 2002, at 11:00 a.m. (NNP02-MS/RR/NB)
03/26/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
04/09/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Argued by: James Georgeson for Petitioner and kevin Pasquale for Real Party in Interest. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
05/17/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition granted." We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus. Before Shearing, Rose and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 40. NNP02 02-08713
05/17/2002WritIssued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of opinion mailed to C. James Georgeson for service upon Judge Steven R. Kosach. 02-08727
06/11/2002RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 02-09059
06/11/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/19/2002WritFiled Writ. Served on Judge Steven R. Kosach on June 18, 2002. 02-08727