judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9526
A-9526
03/27/1963
Application for Writ of Error
SOUTHWESTERN STATES OIL AND GAS COMPANY
SOVEREIGN RESOURCES, INC., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/01/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/18/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/15/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
03/27/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/27/1963Response to Motion filed
08/01/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/18/1963Reply to Response
04/15/1963Response to Petition
03/27/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/27/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Southwestern States Oil and Gas CompanyPetitioner
Sovereign Resources, Inc., et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information