judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9525
A-9525
03/27/1963
Application for Writ of Error
BROADWAY PLAN, ET AL.
FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF HANDLEY, W. L. RAVENSTEIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/30/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/09/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
04/03/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
03/27/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/03/1963Response to Motion filed
05/30/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/09/1963Response to Petition
04/05/1963Miscellaneous MotionOverruled
04/03/1963Response to Petition
03/27/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/27/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Broadway Plan, et al.Petitioner
W. L. RavensteinRespondent
First National Bank of HandleyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information