Case Heading (S-09-0125) | |||||
Case Number: | S-09-0125 | Case Docketed On: | 06/29/2009 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Second Judicial District Albany County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Motor Vehicles 31-1-101 through 31-18-903 | ||
Short Title: | DAVID O'DONNELL REAGAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | DAVID O'DONNELL REAGAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | David O'Donnell Reagan | Robert Willis Ingram |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Bruce A. Salzburg Terry L. Armitage D. Michael Pauling |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
06/29/2009 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
06/29/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
06/29/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
08/12/2009 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
08/13/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/13/2009 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
08/13/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Robert W. Ingram for appellant. | Notice-Incoming | Entry of appearance | Final | |
08/17/2009 | Motion - Withdrawal of counsel | Motion | Withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
08/18/2009 | Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Public Defender permitted to withdraw as counsel for appellant. | Order | Granting withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
09/29/2009 | Brief - Failure to file - appellant | Brief | Failure to file - appellant | Final | |
09/29/2009 | Order - Dismiss - want of prosecution | Order | Dismiss - want of prosecution | Final | |
10/15/2009 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |