judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9547
A-9547
04/12/1963
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT S. CALVERT, COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS, ET AL.
CANTEEN COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/16/1963Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/22/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
04/12/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/16/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/02/1963Dissenting opinion issued.
10/02/1963Opinion issued
06/19/1963Document received (See Remarks)
06/19/1963Document received (See Remarks)
04/22/1963Response to Petition
04/12/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/12/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Robert S. Calvert, Comptroller of Public Accounts, et al.Petitioner
Canteen Company, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information