judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9551
A-9551
04/15/1963
Application for Writ of Error
WYATT C. HEDRICK
OCHILTREE COUNTY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/01/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/29/1963Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/17/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/29/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
04/15/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/15/1963Response to Motion filed
07/01/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/19/1963Document received (See Remarks)
05/29/1963Supplemental Brief filed
05/17/1963Reply to Response
05/09/1963Letter Filed
04/29/1963Response to Petition
04/19/1963Motion to Amend FiledFiling granted
04/15/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/15/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ochiltree CountyRespondent
Wyatt C. HedrickPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information