judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9508
A-9508
03/21/1963
Application for Writ of Error
HOUSTON PIPE LINE COMPANY
ROBERTA POWELL DWYER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/23/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/03/1963Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
05/01/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
03/21/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/29/1964Response to Motion filed
01/23/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/08/1964Opinion issued
12/03/1963Supplemental Brief filed
07/31/1963Document received (See Remarks)
05/01/1963Response to Petition
03/21/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/21/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HOUSTON PIPE LINE COMPANYPetitioner
Roberta Powell Dwyer, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information