judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9532
A-9532
04/01/1963
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. A. L. SMITH
EAGLE STAR INSURANCE COMPANY, LTD.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/07/1963Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/15/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
04/01/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/07/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/24/1963Opinion issued
04/24/1963Document received (See Remarks)
04/24/1963Document received (See Remarks)
04/15/1963Response to Petition
04/01/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/01/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Eagle Star Insurance Company, Ltd.Respondent
Mrs. A. L. SmithPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information