judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PEPPER (MARY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38341
Short Caption:PEPPER (MARY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR010328Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-14035
09/26/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-16246
09/26/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-16247
10/02/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-16574
11/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-18415
12/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19143
12/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 4, 2001. 01-19143