judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EXCEL CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. HKM ENGINEERING, INC., a Montana corporation

Case Heading (S-09-0120)
Case Number:S-09-0120Case Docketed On:06/24/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Big Horn CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:EXCEL CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. HKM ENGINEERING, INC., a Montana corporation
Full Title:EXCEL CONSTRUCTION, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. HKM ENGINEERING, INC., a Montana corporation, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantExcel Construction, Inc., a Wyoming corporationPatrick J. Murphy
AppelleeHKM Engineering, Inc., a Montana corporationMatthew Freeman McLean

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Fraud, Negligence, Professional negligence
Opinion Number:201 WY 34
Citation:228 P.3d 40

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/24/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/24/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/06/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/22/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's response briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/12/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/20/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/26/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/27/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memoNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
10/28/2009Order - Assignment of judge - Michael K. Davis, District Judge, assigned to act for Chief Justice Voigt in this matter.OrderAssignment of judge/justiceFinal
11/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/03/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
11/04/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
11/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Oral ArgumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Patrick Murphy for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Matthew F. McLean for apellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/16/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before Justices Golden, Hill, Kite and Burke, and Davis, DJ (Patrick J. Murphy for appellant; Matthew F. McLean for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/16/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/23/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, District Judge Davis writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/08/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/08/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/14/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/12/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal