judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9683
A-9683
06/27/1963
Application for Writ of Error
JIM C. MCKELVY
DR. FORREST C. BARBER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/21/1964Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/06/1964Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
03/27/1964Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/24/1964Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
03/18/1964Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/08/1963Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
09/20/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
06/27/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/25/1964Response to Motion filed
07/21/1964Motion for Rehearing
07/08/1964Dissenting opinion issued.
07/08/1964Opinion issued
04/06/1964Brief on the Merits
03/27/1964Supplemental Brief filed
03/24/1964Response to Motion filed
03/24/1964Brief in Support of Petition
03/18/1964Motion for Rehearing
03/04/1964Opinion issued
11/08/1963Supplemental Brief filed
10/02/1963Document received (See Remarks)
09/20/1963Response to Petition
07/10/1963Letter Filed
06/27/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledOverruled
06/27/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dr. Forrest C. BarberRespondent
Jim C. McKelvyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information