judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9708
A-9708
07/03/1963
Application for Writ of Error
YOUNG COUNTY LUMBER COMPANY
BILL JACK EVANS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/14/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/18/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
07/03/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/02/1963Letter Filed
09/26/1963Letter Filed
08/15/1963Response to Motion filed
08/14/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/29/1963Supplement to Motion filed
07/22/1963Response to Motion filed
07/18/1963Response to Petition
07/06/1963Motion to dismissFiling granted
07/03/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledDismissed
07/03/1963Document received (See Remarks)
07/03/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Young County Lumber CompanyPetitioner
Bill Jack Evans, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information