judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO BATES

Case Information: 38340
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO BATESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D260331Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-14036
08/21/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
08/29/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from James Edward Bates--money order no. 06-470646525.
09/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-15339
10/09/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-15649
10/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/02/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2001. 01-15649