judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GAIL L. HARPER v. FIDELITY AND GUARANTY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Heading (S-09-0119)
Case Number:S-09-0119Case Docketed On:06/24/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Insurance Code (Title 26)
Short Title:GAIL L. HARPER v. FIDELITY AND GUARANTY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Full Title:GAIL L. HARPER, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. FIDELITY AND GUARANTY LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGail L. HarperStephen R. Winship
AppelleeFidelity and Guaranty Life Insurance CompanyJulie Nye Tiedeken

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Insurance Law
Opinion Number:2010 WY 89
Citation:234 P.3d 1211

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/24/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/24/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/07/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/11/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Extend Time for Filing Appellant's Brief (Received 3 days late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/30/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/14/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/26/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/27/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/30/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
10/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Julie Tiedeken for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/02/2009Event - Hardcopy received - motion to vacate oral argument.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/02/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
11/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/16/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Stephen R. Winship for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/19/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Julie Nye Tiedeken for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/14/2009Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
12/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Errata to appellant's opening briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/17/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Stephen R. Winship for appellant; Julie Nye Tiedeken for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/17/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/06/2010Motion - Supplement the record filed in the District CourtMotionSupplement the recordFinal
02/26/2010Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
02/26/2010Event - Phone Call to District Court Clerk requesting pleading allowed to be supplemented by Judge Skavdahl's Order. Request from counsel for Appellant was submitted as a "Motion" but notification that Judge had entered Order.EventPhone CallFinal
03/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Supplement to Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/15/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/15/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/15/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/19/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/16/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal