judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES C. PRICE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0063
Short Caption:JAMES C. PRICE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-25927-09Filed Date:01/19/2011

Opening Event Date:01/19/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/31/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames C. Price Y
Andrew R. SzekelyNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/19/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/28/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Andrew Szekely, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
01/28/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Andrew Szekely, Esquire
02/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (30 pgs/Shelton) 10/25/10 proc. w/cd
02/15/2011RECEIVED - statement re transcript. (no signature on pleading---returned)
02/15/2011RECEIVED - mot for appeal transcript.
02/25/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
02/28/2011RECORD INDEX
02/28/2011RECORD COPIES
03/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (10 pgs/tape) 1/6/11 proc. w/cd
03/01/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/09/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/11/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 40 days from 4/18/11. no oppo
04/29/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 31, 2011. (JAC) '
05/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 40 days no oppo
05/31/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 11, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC)
07/11/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
07/13/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant)
07/28/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to dismiss and denying appellant's motion for an extension of time as moot.
07/28/2011FiledDismissed
08/31/2011FiledMandate