judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9730
A-9730
07/12/1963
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF CORPUS CHRISTI
SOUTHERN COMMUNITY GAS COMPANY, A CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/25/1963Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/17/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/16/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/13/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
07/12/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/07/1963Letter Filed
10/25/1963Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/17/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/16/1963Reply to Response
08/13/1963Response to Petition
07/12/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/12/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Corpus ChristiPetitioner
Southern Community Gas Company, a CorporationRespondent
Texas City Attorneys AssociationAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information