judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-97-00013-CV
07-97-00013-CV
01/14/1997
Miscellaneous civil
Breen, Debbie and Emmett, Individually and as Parents of Morgan Ward, a Minor
Cytogenetics Laboratory
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/30/1997Mandate Issued
04/30/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedGRANT
04/30/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
04/30/1997Submitted
04/30/1997Submission
04/17/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
02/13/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
02/12/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/14/1997Do not use
01/14/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/30/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cytogenetics LaboratoryAppelleeKevin L. Williams
Breen, Debbie And Emmett IndiAppellantMr. Charles Edward Moody
David R. Weiner
Trial Court Information
99th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Mackey K. Hancock
93-541,673