judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE SENIOR SURVIVAL LEGAL PLAN

Case Information: 33534
Short Caption:IN RE SENIOR SURVIVAL LEGAL PLANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Other - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/29/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Senior Survival Group Legal Services--check no. 1548.
12/29/1998Petition/BarFiled Petition for Certification pursuant to SCR 42.5. SCR 42.5 Original Filing. 98-00552
03/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The State Bar shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file points and authorities evaluating petitioner's compliance with SCR 42.5. Within 30 days thereafter, petitioner may file responsive points and authorities and any supplemental documents deemed necessary by the state bar. Upon receipt of petitioner's response, the petition shall be deemed submitted for this court's final revies. Petitioner is hereby ordred to submit a copy of its petition and exhibits to the State Bar, whether or not it has previously done so. 99-02073
04/06/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response and Recommendation. 99-02562
07/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a response addressing the concerns in the State Bar's recommendation. Failure to file a response may be viewed as an abandonment of the petition, and may result in the dismissal of the petition as abandoned. 99-06218
11/30/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Petition. Order Dismissing Petition. This is a petition for certification of a legal services plan pursuant to SCR 42.5. To date, petitioner has failed to respond to our order of July 13, 1999 in any way. We conclude that the petition has been abandoned, and " . . . so dismiss this petition." En Banc. 99-11919
11/30/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.