judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-97-00014-CV
07-97-00014-CV
01/14/1997
Miscellaneous civil
Howell, In the Matter of the Estate of French
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/15/1997Mandate Issued
04/15/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
04/15/1997Submitted
04/15/1997Submission
04/14/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
03/24/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
03/21/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
02/27/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
02/12/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
02/11/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/14/1997Do not use
01/14/1997Do not use
01/14/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/15/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Howell, In The Matter Of The EAppellantDon Graf
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 3
Lubbock
Honorable Paula Davis Lanehart
95-779,519