judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-97-00024-CV
03-97-00024-CV
01/14/1997
Administrative law
Southwestern Public Service Company/Public Utility Commission of Texas and City of Amarillo
Public Utility Commission of Texas, City of Amarillo, ASARCO, Inc., and Texas Industrial Energy Consumers/Southwestern Public Service Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/15/2012Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/05/2000Case stored
02/26/1999Exhibits returned to the district or county clerk
10/26/1998Mandate Issued
10/26/1998Letter requesting pickup of exhibits
08/25/1998Peition for Review disposed in Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
03/16/1998Peition for Review disposed in Supreme Court
01/29/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed in part; Reversed and Rendered in part
01/09/1998Brief filed
12/23/1997Brief received, not filed
12/11/1997Brief received, not filed
11/24/1997Brief received, not filed
11/21/1997Brief received, not filed
09/16/1997list of additional authorities
09/10/1997Submitted
09/10/1997Submission
09/09/1997miscellaneous motion dispOverruled
08/18/1997Oral argument acknowledged
08/14/1997Oral argument acknowledged
08/12/1997Oral argument acknowledged
08/11/1997Oral argument acknowledged
08/06/1997Oral argument acknowledged
08/04/1997Submission
07/07/1997miscellaneous motion filed
06/25/1997Mt file Supp Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/16/1997Reply brief filed
06/16/1997Mt file Supplemental Record Filed
04/18/1997Brief filed
04/18/1997Brief filed
04/18/1997Brief filed
04/18/1997Case ready to be set
04/07/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/04/1997Brief filed
04/02/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/19/1997Exhibits filed
03/10/1997Brief filed
03/10/1997Brief filed
03/10/1997Brief filed
03/04/1997Letter received
03/03/1997Response to Motion
02/18/1997Response to Motion
02/11/1997Response requested (postcard)
02/07/1997Statement of Facts Filed
02/07/1997Statement of Facts Received
02/06/1997Transcript Filed
02/06/1997Transcript Received
02/04/1997Motion for ext of time to file cost bond disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/14/1997Motion for ext of time to file cost bond filed
01/14/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City Of Amarillo, TexasAppellantThe Honorable Merrill Nunn
Public Utility Commission Of TAppelleeThe Honorable Dan Morales
Ms. Elizabeth R. B. Sterling
Texas Industrial Energy ConsumAppelleeMr. Rex VanMiddlesworth
Southwestern Public Service CoAppellantMr. Jerry F. Shackelford
Mr. Kirt E. Moelling
Mr. Steven T. Arnold
Mr. Charles R. Watson
Steering Comm. Cities ServedCivil - Amicus CuriaeMr. Geoffrey M. Gay
Texas Coalition Of CitiesCivil - Amicus CuriaeMr. Walter Washington
Mr. Steven A. Porter
Texas Utilities Electric Co.Interested partyMr. Howard Fisher
Lone Star Gas CompanyCivil - Amicus CuriaeMr. David C. Duggins
Asarco IncorporatedAppelleeMr. C. Brian Cassidy
Brenham Hempstead Navasota SeaCivil - Amicus CuriaeMr. John R. Hays Jr.
Asarco, IncorporatedAppelleeMr. J. Alan Holman
Trial Court Information
98th District Court
Travis
Honorable Margaret A. Cooper
96-06109