judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-97-00014-CR
10-97-00014-CR
01/14/1997
Felony DWI
William Thomas Corley
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/23/1998Case stored
03/23/1998Mandate issued by this Court
03/06/1998Case returned from higher court
02/04/1998Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
12/10/1997Case forwarded to higher court
12/05/1997Petition for Discretionary Review filed
11/05/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/03/1997Submitted
09/03/1997Submission
08/05/1997Submission
06/03/1997Brief filed, oral argument requested
06/03/1997Case ready to be set
05/07/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/01/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
04/18/1997Brief filed, oral argument requested
03/20/1997Exhibits Filed
03/20/1997No Description Available.
03/20/1997No Description Available.
03/18/1997No Description Available.
01/14/1997Notice of Appeal filed
01/14/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/23/2023Case StoredDestroy case in 25 years.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Corley, William ThomasAppellantJerry L. Wood
Guy K. Rodgers
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasBill Moore
Stuart M. Madison
Trial Court Information
M9500483
6mths probated for 2 yrs