judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-97-00045-CR
01-97-00045-CR
01/14/1997
Assault & battery
Cozart, Dalton Dewitt
The State of Texas
No
11th Court of Appeals
01/27/1997
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/21/1997Record due
01/27/1997Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGrant motion
01/27/1997Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGrant motion
01/14/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
12/31/1996Notice of appeal filed
11/21/1996Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21)
10/24/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/27/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateOther interested partyCharles Bacarisse
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
726267
40 years