Case Information: 33533 | |||
Short Caption: | WHITTLESEA BLUE CAB VS. FELDMAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A374801 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/15/1999 / Zucker, Carol | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/29/1998 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bell United Insurance Company--check no. 16589. | ||
12/29/1998 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 98-00549 | |
01/06/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bell United Insurance Company--check no. 16612. | ||
01/06/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-00056 | |
01/11/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Ace Cab and Scott A. Stauffer's Motion to Dismiss Appeal (mailed on: 01/07/99). | 99-00147 | |
01/15/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carol Zucker. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
01/20/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-00383 | |
01/20/1999 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Ace Cab and Scott A. Stauffer's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 99-00394 | |
01/25/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (Regarding Notice of Appeal filed January 6, 1999). | 99-00510 | |
04/05/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondents Ace Cab, Inc. and Scott A. Stauffer's Supplement to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 99-02529 | |
10/22/1999 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Status Report. | 99-10347 | |
11/29/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 99-11881 | |
12/15/1999 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[We defer ruling on respondents' motions filed January 11, 1999 and April 5, 1999, seeking to dismiss appellant's appeals in this matter]. | 99-12697 | |
01/03/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 00-00005 | |
01/24/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. In this court's order filed December 15, 1999, we deferred ruling on respondents' motions filed on January 11, 1999, and April 5, 1999, seeking to dismiss appellant's appeals in this matter. We hereby stay briefing in this matter pending resolution of respondents' motion to dismiss. | 00-01084 | |
04/17/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We grant respondents' motion, and we hereby "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to change the caption on this court's docket to conform to the caption on this order.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-06056 | |
05/16/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-08148 | |
05/16/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/26/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 25, 2000. | 00-08148 |