Case: A-4612
A-4612
04/02/1954
Application for Writ of Error
CHARLES H. WRIGHT, ET AL.
MAY WRIGHT, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/14/1955 | Response to Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
01/18/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
06/05/1954 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | | |
04/14/1954 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
04/08/1954 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
04/02/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/14/1955 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
01/18/1955 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
01/05/1955 | Opinion issued | | ||
06/05/1954 | Brief on the Merits | | ||
05/12/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
05/12/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
05/12/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
05/12/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/14/1954 | Reply to Response | | ||
04/08/1954 | Response to Petition | | ||
04/02/1954 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
04/02/1954 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Charles H. Wright, et al. | Petitioner | |
May Wright, et al. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information