judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0073-97
PD-0073-97
01/15/1997
PDR Case Type
HUTCHINSON, CHARLES EUGENE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/27/1997FINAL DISPRefused
03/17/1997REHEAR RECEIVED
03/17/1997REHEAR REJECTED
02/26/1997PDR DISPRefused
02/26/1997PDR DISPRefused
02/18/1997NO RESPONSE FILED
01/16/1997MOTION DISPGranted
01/15/1997PDR FILED
01/15/1997MOTION FILED
01/15/1997PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/28/1997STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hutchinson, Charles EugeneApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Charles Eugene Hutchinson
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Court of Appeals Information:
05-92-00155-CR
AFF 5-21-96
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 2 of Dallas County
Dallas
Honorable Larry Baraka
F-9159520-HI