judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-97-00002-CV
06-97-00002-CV
01/14/1997
Divorce
In The Matter Of The Marriage Of Mitzie Dee Duke and Cary Van Duke
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/24/2006Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
08/22/1997Mandate Issued
06/12/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/11/1997Submitted
06/11/1997Submission
05/06/1997Brief Filed
05/06/1997Case ready to be set
04/28/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/16/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/26/1997Brief Filed
03/07/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/25/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/27/1997Statement of Facts Filed
01/14/1997Transcript Filed
01/14/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/22/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cary Van DukeAppelleeEdward D. Ellis
Mitzie Dee DukeAppellantHon. Sybil K. Colson
Marvin Ann Patterson, dist.clk. Trial court clerkMs. Marvin Ann Patterson
Hon. Jim N. Thompson, JudgeJUDGEHon. Jim Noble Thompson
Trial Court Information
62nd District Court
Lamar
63012