judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GES, INC. VS. LAS VEGAS SANDS

Case Information: 33529
Short Caption:GES, INC. VS. LAS VEGAS SANDSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A334048Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/12/1999 / Dentico, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/29/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of John & Elizabeth Foley--check no. 8703.
12/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00543
01/04/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: dated September 15, 1998; July 15, 16 and 17, 1998. To Court Reporter: Tom Mercer. 99-00018
01/12/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael V. Dentico. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/14/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00270
03/15/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 3/29/99. 99-01852
04/01/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-02432
04/01/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-02433
04/01/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-02434
04/09/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, this appeal is hereby dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. 99-02718
04/09/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.