Case Heading (S-09-0136) | |||||
Case Number: | S-09-0136 | Case Docketed On: | 07/08/2009 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Ninth Judicial District Fremont County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Corporations, Partnerships and Associations (Title 17) | ||
Short Title: | ORTHOPAEDICS OF JACKSON HOLE, P.C., d/b/a TETON ORTHOPAEDICS v. MICHAEL J. FORD, M.D. | ||||
Full Title: | ORTHOPAEDICS OF JACKSON HOLE, P.C., d/b/a TETON ORTHOPAEDICS, Appellant (Defendant), v. MICHAEL J. FORD, M.D., Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Orthopaedics of Jackson Hole, P.C. | Gary R. Scott |
Appellee | Michael James Ford | Joel M. Vincent Paul J. Hickey O'Kelley H. Pearson |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Corporations/Partnership/Limited Liability Entities |
Opinion Number: | 2011 WY 50 |
Citation: | 250 P.3d 1092 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
07/08/2009 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
07/08/2009 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
07/08/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
07/08/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
08/25/2009 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
08/25/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/03/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Paul J. Hickey on behalf of Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Entry of appearance | Final | |
09/09/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by O'Kelley H. Pearson on behalf of Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Entry of appearance | Final | |
10/12/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
10/12/2009 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
10/13/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/30/2009 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
11/02/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
11/02/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/04/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
11/06/2009 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volumes IV-V, Exhibits. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
11/12/2009 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
11/19/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Gary R. Scott for appellant. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
11/19/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Joel M. Vincent for appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
12/17/2009 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Gary R. Scott for appellant; Joel M. Vincent and O'Kelley H. Pearson, argument by Mr. Vincent for appellee) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
12/17/2009 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
03/21/2011 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming part and reversing part, Justice Golden writing for Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
04/06/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
04/06/2011 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
04/06/2011 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
04/06/2011 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
04/08/2011 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated). | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |