judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 97-0061
97-0061
01/17/1997
See former TRAP 130(D)
CYPRESS-FAIRBANKS INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
MARGARET M. FOLTIN et al.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/22/1997Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedRespondenton behalf of Charles F. Klores
04/11/1997Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/06/1997Reply to ResponseRespondenton behalf of Victor Klores, Ruth Klores, Charles Foltin, Kenneth Hardcastle, et al. (no copy returned; no S.A.S.E.)
02/10/1997Reply to ResponseRespondenton behalf of Charles f. Klores
01/31/1997Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/22/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
04/25/1997Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruledrehearing overruled
04/22/1997Reply to Response to Motion for Rehearing filedon behalf of Charles F. Klores
04/11/1997Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
04/11/1997Motion for Rehearing
04/11/1997Motion for Rehearing forwardedRecord remains in the clerk's office
03/27/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApplication for writ of error is denied, with the notation, "Writ Denied".
03/06/1997Reply to Responseon behalf of Victor Klores, Ruth Klores, Charles Foltin, Kenneth Hardcastle, et al. (no copy returned; no S.A.S.E.)
02/24/1997Description of document returned to Supreme CourtAddress updated for Mr. Joe Dyer Klores; all notices resent.
02/19/1997Case forwarded to Court
02/10/1997Reply to Responseon behalf of Charles f. Klores
01/31/1997Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/30/1997Description of document returned to Supreme CourtNo Good address for Mr. Joe Dyer Klores; all notices placed w/ record.
01/24/1997Addendum to brief filedVerification page
01/21/1997APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ERROR IS DUE TO BE FILEDApp due in the COA on or before 15 January, 1997
01/21/1997Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling grantedApplication due on or before 15 Janury, 1997.
01/17/1997Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/22/1997Case StoredCase stored.1G5 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
FOLTIN, MARGARETRespondentMr. John E. Swain
CYPRESS-FAIRBANKS INDEPENDENTPetitionerMs. Monica Marie McCoy
Ms. Judith A. Hargrove
THE STATE OF TX-CO. OF HARRISRespondentMrs. Valerie Ueckert Milholland
KLORES, CHARLES FREDERICKRespondentMr. Ben A. Baring Jr.
Ms. Susan J. Taylor
KLORES, JOE DYERRespondentMr. Joe Dyer Klores
KLORES, VICTOR TRUITTRespondentMs. Susan J. Taylor
FOLTIN, CHARLESRespondentMr. John E. Swain
KLORES, RUTH ETHELRespondentMs. Susan J. Taylor
Court of Appeals Information:
14-95-00278-CV
Affirmed/Rev'd & Remd'd
930 SW2d 270, 09-05-96
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable RICHARD H. EDELMAN
Trial Court Information
11th District Court
Harris
93-24250