judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 97-0056
97-0056
01/17/1997
App Writ of Error
LEMUEL E. HAWSEY III
LOUISIANA DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES and GORDON HOOD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
01/22/1997Reply to ResponseRespondent
01/17/1997Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/11/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
05/21/1997Record returned to Court of Appealscase stored
03/21/1997Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDeniedApplication for writ of error is denied, with the notation, "Writ Denied".
01/29/1997Case forwarded to Court
01/22/1997Notice requesting filing fee$5.00; to James B. Doyle (reply)
01/22/1997Reply to Response
01/17/1997Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
05/21/1997Case StoredCase stored.1G5 record returned
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
HAWSEY, LEMUEL E.PetitionerMr. Mitchell A. Toups
Mr. David L. Tolin Sr.
LOUISIANA DEPARTMENT OF SOCIALRespondentMr. James B. Doyle
HOOD, GORDONRespondentMr. James B. Doyle
Court of Appeals Information:
01-94-00882-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
934 SW2d 723, 08-15-96
1st Court of Appeals
Honorable TIM TAFT
Trial Court Information
11th District Court
Harris
Honorable Mark D. Davidson
93-50268