judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-97-00016-CR
09-97-00016-CR
01/17/1997
Felony DWI
Jones, Randy Allen
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/05/1997Mandate Issued
05/05/1997MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
03/20/1997Order EnteredDismissed
03/10/1997Letter
03/04/1997Supplemental Transcript filed
03/04/1997Transcript Filed
02/28/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/24/1997Transcript Received
01/17/1997Notice of Appeal Filed
01/17/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/05/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasRodney D. Conerly
Jones, Randy AllenAppellantJames A. DeLee
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Charles D Carver
69891
8 years