judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-97-00090-CV
05-97-00090-CV
01/17/1997
Contract
Patrick Martin and Donna Martin
Federal Financial Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/2017Order enteredDestroy
11/02/2016Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
12/09/2015Letter issued by the court
05/27/1999Record RetentionDestroy
05/21/1999Mandate Issued
05/21/1999Mandate Issued
03/23/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/23/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/15/1998Submitted
12/15/1998Submission
12/15/1998Submitted
09/24/1998Letter Received
09/16/1998Submission
05/07/1997Letter Filed
04/29/1997Letter Filed
03/17/1997Brief Filed
03/17/1997Case ready to be set
03/17/1997Case ready to be set
03/16/1997MattConv
02/25/1997Letter Filed
02/19/1997Brief Filed
02/16/1997MattConv
01/28/1997Letter Filed
01/17/1997Record due
01/17/1997Statement of Facts Filed
01/17/1997Transcript Filed
01/17/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
12/18/1996Appeal Bond Due
12/09/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/17/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
09/19/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Martin, Patrick And DonnaAppellantKenneth C. Johnston
Federal Financial CompanyAppelleeKenneth S. Carroll
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1
Collin
Honorable Weldon S. Copeland
1-197-94