judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-97-00015-CR
09-97-00015-CR
01/17/1997
Injury to a Child
Hanks, John Clifton
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/08/1998Mandate Issued
07/08/1998MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
07/07/1998Case Returned from Higher Ct.
06/17/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/18/1998Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/29/1998Petition for ReviewRefused
03/04/1998Petition for ReviewFiled in Higher Court
02/26/1998Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/20/1998Petition for Review
01/20/1998Motion ext time file Petition for Disc. ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
12/17/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/17/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/06/1997Submitted
10/06/1997Submission
09/15/199721 Day Submission
09/15/1997Brief Filed
09/15/1997Case ready to be set
09/05/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/05/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/07/1997Brief Filed
06/10/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/06/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/14/1997Brief received, not filed
04/07/1997Statement of Facts Filed
03/12/1997Transcript Filed
01/17/1997Notice of Appeal Filed
01/17/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/08/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hanks, John CliftonAppellantJames A. DeLee
John C. Hanks
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasWayln G. Thompson
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Charles D Carver
69725
25 years