judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GES, INC. VS. CORBITT

Case Information: 33528
Short Caption:GES, INC. VS. CORBITTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A356334Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/12/1999 / Dentico, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/16/2000 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:11/16/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/29/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Law Offices of John & Elizabeth Foley--check no. 8699.
12/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00538
01/04/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: dated September 7 through October 7, 1998. To Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholsan. 99-00016
01/12/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael V. Dentico. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/12/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed 12/17/98. Due Date: 10 days
01/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
01/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-00214
01/14/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-00269
01/25/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
01/25/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order re: Powerline's Motion for Good Faith Settlement filed 12/17/98. 99-00506
01/28/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
03/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant/cross-respondent shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. 99-01830
03/26/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Withdrawl of Cross-Appeal. 99-02202
03/30/1999Notice/Outgoing Letter.
04/09/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 4/30/99. 99-02705
04/21/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On March 26, 1999, appellants filed a notice of withdrawal of their appeal. To date, the required filing fee has not been paid. Appellants shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, submit the $200 filing fee to this court. Nevertheless, " . . . we hereby dismiss appellants' appeal." Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. fn1[The clerk shall amend the caption on this court's docket to reflect that GES, Inc., is the appellant and Jeff Corbitt, Michelle Corbitt, C. Michael Alt and James R. DeLong are the respondents]. NNP99A-CY/MS/ML Document No. 99-03116 99-03116
04/30/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Bradley L. Booke-check no. 3219.
05/03/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a partial settlement of this matter. 99-03517
05/03/1999Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 99-03519
05/03/1999Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 99-03520
05/13/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice to Correct Caption. 99-03903
05/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed as to respondents Michael Alt and James R. Delong only, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees." NRAP 42(b). The clerk shall remove Michael Alt and James R. Delong as respondents from the caption of this court's docket forthwith. NNP/CLK 99-03963
06/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. Nevertheless, the briefing and request for transcripts shall remain suspended pending a jurisdictional review and further order of this court. 99-04675
08/20/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address. 99-07795
08/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. This court has jurisdiction to proceed. The clerk shall add to the docket respondents Powerline, Inc., and VIP Global Designs, Inc. Opening brief due: 70 days. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-07948
09/30/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 9/10/98, 9/11/98 (2), 9/14/98, 9/15/98, 9/16/98, 9/17/98, 9/18/98, 9/21/98, 9/22/98, 9/23/98, 9/24/98, 9/25/98, 9/28/98, 9/29/98, 9/30/98, 10/2/98, 10/5/98, 10/6/98. Court Reporter: Sharleen Nicholson. 99-09380
09/30/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing for transcripts. 99-09384
11/05/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 11/4/99. 99-10886
11/05/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-10887
12/01/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. (Respondents Jeff and Michelle Corbitt.) Brief due: January 6, 2000. 99-12014
12/07/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondents Powerline, Inc. and VIP Global Designs, Inc. Brief due: January 6, 2000. 99-12237
12/30/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time for filing Powerline, Inc. and Vip Global Designs, Inc.'s Answering Brief. 99-13404
01/06/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (1) Respondents Corbitts' Motion to Compel Appellant's Compliance with NRAP 9; (2) Respondents Corbitts' Motion to Extend Time to Submit Answering Brief Pending Appellant's Compliance with NRAP 9. 00-00200
01/06/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Respondents Jeff and Michelle Corbitts' Answering Brief. 00-00230
01/10/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Response to Respondents Corbitts' Motion to Compel Appellant's Compliance with NRAP 9; and to Respondent Corbitts' Motion to Extend Time to Submit Answering Brief Pending Appellant's Compliance with NRAP 9. 00-00396
01/11/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Joinder. Defendant/Appellee Powerline, Inc. and VIP Global Design, Inc's Joinder in Plaintiffs/Appellee Jeff Corbitt and Michelle Corbitt's Motion to Compel Compliance and to Extend the Time to Submit Answering Brief Pending Compliance. 00-00450
01/12/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy (re: transcripts). 00-00521
01/24/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Response to Defendant/Appellee Powerline, Inc., and VIP Global Design, Inc.'s Joinder in Plaintiffs/Appellees Jeff Corbitt and Michelle Corbitt's Motion to Compel Compliance and to Extend the time to submit Answering Brief Pending Compliance. 00-01123
01/24/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Receipt of Copy for trial transcripts. 00-01124
02/17/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned Unfiled Respondents, Powerline, Inc. and VIP Global Designs, Inc.'s Appendix to Their Answering Brief.
03/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 6, 2000, respondents Corbitt filed a motion to compel appellant's compliance with NRAP 9 and to extend their time for filing the answeirng brief. Appellant has filed responses. Appellant has now provided respondents with copies of those transcripts. Appellant notes that a deposition was played for the jury and the court, but was not transcribed. fn2[If appellant deems it necessary, it may file a motion requesting the transmission to this court of the actual video tape shown to the jury and district court judge.] We deny respondents' motions as moot. Nonethless, we direct the clerk to file the answering brief provisionally received on February 17, 2000, and the appendix provisionally received on February 24, 2000. Respondents Corbitt shall, within 20 days of the date of this order, file and serve their answering brief. Thereafter, appellant shall have 30 days to file and serve a single reply brief. The December 30, 1999, and January 6, 2000, stipulation for extensions of time to file the answering briefs are disapproved as moot. 00-04044
03/14/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. 00-02561
03/14/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-02925
03/23/2000MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion Requesting Transmission to this Court of Original Video Tape Shown to Jury and District Court Judge and the Written Transcript Thereof Certified by Lori M. Judd Certified Court Reporter #233 on September 27, 1998. 00-04651
04/07/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 4/3/00. Respondent's Jeff and Michelle Corbitts' Answering Brief. 00-05604
04/07/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Repondent's Jeff and Michelle Corbitt. 00-05606
04/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of the Clark County District Court shall forthwith transmit to this court as part of the appellate court record the original video tape and original transcript of testimony of Bart DeLorenzo taken Sunday, September 27, 1998, in Denver, Colorado. 00-06139
05/04/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 5/4/00. 00-07439
05/04/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 00-07440
09/01/2000BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Mailed on: 8/29/00. 00-15528
10/09/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on November 16, 2000 at 9:30 a.m. in Las Vegas. (SNP00A-1 - CY/RR/NB)
11/02/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
11/16/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP00A-WM/RR/NB.
11/22/2000MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Appendix to Appellant's Briefs. 00-20581
12/01/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's unopposed motion to file a supplemental appendix to appellant's briefs. Accordingly, the clerk of this court shall file the supplemental appendis provisionally received on November 22, 2000. 00-21040
12/01/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. 00-20582
04/13/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Dismissed in part, affirmed in part, reversed in part and remanded." fn19[Our ruling today renders moot issues relating to the finding below that the Powerline/VIP settlement was entered into in good faith. Accordingly, we dismiss that portion of GES's appeal relating to the district court's post-judgment settlement order. We have also examined appellant's other assignments of error and conclude that they lack merit.] Before Maupin, C.J., Rose and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 26. SNP001A 01-06384
04/23/2001MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's NRCP 60(a) Motion to Correct Clerical Mistake in Opinion filed April 13, 2001. 01-06880
05/02/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Law Offices of John & Elizabeth Foley--check no. 1311.
05/02/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-07341
05/03/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On April 23, 2001, appellant filed a motion to correct a clerical mistake in this court's opinion issued on April 13, 2001. This court's opinion has been corrected to state that the district court judgment "awarded damages exceeding $1,100,000 against Powerline/VIP and GES." We deny appellant's motion to correct as moot. 01-07433
05/04/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed May 2, 2001. Appellant shall have to and including May 16, 2001, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. 01-07478
05/17/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Appellant's Petition for Rehearing (NRAP 40). Mailed on: LV Drop Box 5/16/01. 01-08200
05/18/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to file Brief on Amicus Curiae on GES's Motion for Rehearing. 01-08307
05/30/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Associated General Contractors' Motion for Leave to File Brief on Amicus Curiae. 01-09012
08/10/2001Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We deny Associated General Contractors, Las Vegas Chapter's motion to file an amicus curiae brief; the motion is untimely. NRAP 29. We direct the court clerk to return, unfiled, the amicus brief received on May 18, 2001.] SNP01A-WM/RR/NB 01-13568
08/10/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney J. Michael McGroarty. Returned original and one copy of Associated General Contractors, Las Vegas Chapter's Brief on Amicus Curiae, received May 18, 2001.
08/28/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: 3 Original videotapes and transcript of video deposition of Bart Delorenzo taken 9/27/98 this day. 01-13819
08/28/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 31, 2001. 01-13819