judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAMELA NADINE HAMILTON v. HARRY DWAYNE HAMILTON

Case Heading (S-09-0135)
Case Number:S-09-0135Case Docketed On:07/07/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:PAMELA NADINE HAMILTON v. HARRY DWAYNE HAMILTON
Full Title:PAMELA NADINE HAMILTON, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. HARRY DWAYNE HAMILTON, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPamela Nadine HamiltonW. Keith Goody
AppelleeHarry Dwayne HamiltonJohn A. Thomas

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Contempt
Opinion Number:2010 WY 35
Citation:228 P.3d 51

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/07/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/07/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/17/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Pamela Nadine HamiltonEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/17/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/22/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
09/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Harry Dwayne HamiltonEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/02/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
10/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant Pamela Nadine Hamilton (Untimely, received 3 days late)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/09/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
10/13/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
11/03/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
03/23/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/08/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/08/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/14/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/12/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal