judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-97-00084-CR
05-97-00084-CR
01/17/1997
Possession of Cocaine
Anderson, Felicia R.
The State of Texas
No
10th Court of Appeals
02/05/1997
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/1997Record due
02/07/1997Statement of Facts Filed
02/05/1997Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/1997Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
01/17/1997Notice Sent
01/17/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
12/20/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
12/20/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/05/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasSue Korioth
Anderson, Felicia R.Criminal - AppellantTerri Hamby
Trial Court Information
283rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Molly Francis
F94-57195-PT
3 Yrs Pen/Fine 500