judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-97-00011-CV
12-97-00011-CV
01/17/1997
Divorce
Routt, Steven Ed
Routt, Christi, and In the Interest of Children
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/26/1997Brief was not filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/2006Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
10/10/1997
09/29/1997Mandate Issued
09/29/1997Case stored
09/08/1997
08/22/1997Motion for rehearing was not filed
08/07/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
07/30/1997Letter from the Court
07/17/1997Letter from the Court
06/03/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/20/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/08/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/11/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/26/1997Brief was not filed
02/20/1997letter filed
01/24/1997Filing Fee Paid
01/21/1997
01/17/1997No Description Available.
01/17/1997No Description Available.
01/17/1997Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
12/23/1996Surety Bond Filed
09/30/1996request for findings of fact & conclusions filed
09/23/1996Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/2012Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Routt, Steven EdAppellantMr. Kerry D. Lee
Routt, Christi And In The IntAppelleeMr. John E. Freeman
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Smith
Honorable Randall Lee Rogers
95-2123-F