judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00266-CR
02-94-00266-CR
06/08/1994
All Misdemeanors
Ragan, Michelle Salena
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1996Mandate Issued
05/01/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
03/15/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
02/29/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/05/1996Response Filed
01/25/1996Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/18/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/04/1995Submitted
10/04/1995Submission
08/01/1995Brief Filed
08/01/1995Case ready to be set
11/23/1994Brief Filed
09/09/1994Submission
09/06/1994Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
06/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
06/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Ragan, Michelle SalenaCriminal - AppellantLarry G. Coker
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Wallace Bowman, Judge, County Criminal Court No. 4
0511853
2 YRS PROBATION