judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0645-94
PD-0645-94
06/08/1994
PDR Case Type
PEOPLES, JOHNNY MACK AKA PEOPLES, JOHNNY M.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/20/1994RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/02/1994FINAL DISPRefused
08/17/1994PDR DISPRefused
08/17/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/20/1994RESPONSE FILED
06/08/1994PDR FILED
06/08/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/13/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateTim Curry
PEOPLES, JOHNNY MACK AKA PEOPLApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Allan K. Butcher
Court of Appeals Information:
02-93-00079-CR
AFF 3-30-94
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 2
Tarrant
Honorable LEE ANN DAUPHINOT
0461664D