judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00558-CV
01-94-00558-CV
06/07/1994
Miscellaneous/other civil
City of Houston, The
El Dorado Mortgage and Investment Corporation
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/04/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/04/1995Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/01/1995No petition for review or writ of error was filed
04/01/1995Writ Due
03/23/1995Motion for leave to fileMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
03/02/1995Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
03/01/1995Motion for leave to file
02/06/1995Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
02/02/1995Motion for rehearing filed
01/19/1995Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
01/05/1995Motion for rehearing filed
12/22/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/22/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/29/1994Submitted
11/29/1994Submission
11/29/1994Submitted
10/14/1994Submission
09/16/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
09/16/1994Case ready to be set
09/16/1994Case ready to be set
08/25/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
07/21/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
07/07/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
06/30/1994Motion strans disposedGrant motion
06/30/1994Supplemental transcript filed
06/23/1994Exhibits filed
06/23/1994Motion strans disposedGrant motion
06/21/1994Motion for leave to file strans
06/10/1994Motion to file original exhibits filed
06/10/1994Statement of facts filed
06/07/1994Transcript filed
06/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/12/1994Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/04/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantGail P. Johnson
StateAppellantRandy L. Pourteau II
StateAppellantBrian Weil Zimmerman
StateAppelleeJohn W. Berkel
Trial Court Information
55th District Court
Harris
Honorable PUTNAM REITER
87-51909