judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00561-CV
01-94-00561-CV
06/07/1994
Original proceeding for writ of habeas corpus (Gov't 22.221(d))
Ex Parte: Stewart A. Feldman
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/26/1994No petition for review or writ of error was filed
09/21/1994Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
09/21/1994Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
08/31/1994Motion for rehearing filed
08/16/1994Opinion issuedGrant motion
08/16/1994Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
08/16/1994Opinion issuedGrant motion
07/29/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
07/27/1994Motion for leave to file strans
07/15/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
07/11/1994Brief filed
07/06/1994Supplemental brief filed
06/30/1994Supplemental brief filed
06/28/1994Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
06/27/1994Memorandum of authorities
06/27/1994Submitted
06/27/1994Submission
06/27/1994Submitted
06/24/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
06/17/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
06/07/1994Motion for leave to file writ of mandamus
06/07/1994Order enteredGrant motion
06/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/26/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateRelatorBrad Beers
StateRespondentLynne Liberato
StateRelatorRussell Rusty Hardin Jr.
StateRespondentWilliam R. Burke Jr.
StateRespondentAlene Ross Levy
StateRespondentDavid Holman
StateRespondentMaria Teresa Arguindegui
Trial Court Information