judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00574-CV
14-94-00574-CV
06/08/1994
Mandamus/prohibition
The Dow Corning Corporation, Et Al
Schneider, Michael H., Judge of 113th District Court, Harris
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/28/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/16/1994Opinion issuedDENIED
06/16/1994Opinion issuedDENIED
06/15/1994Submitted
06/15/1994Submission
06/15/1994Submitted
06/09/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESDENIED
06/08/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
06/08/1994Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
06/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/16/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentHon. Christopher Bradshaw-Hull
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentMarian S. Rosen
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorHon. Suzanne B. Baker
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentPaul F. Waldner
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentRichard N. Laminack
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentMichael T. Gallagher
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 113th District Court
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorHon. Sawnie A. McEntire
Trial Court Information
113th District Court
Harris
Honorable MICHAEL H. SCHNEIDER
92-00393H