judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00207-CV
07-94-00207-CV
06/08/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Sanderson, Harold D.
Fowler, James D. and William R.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/30/2005Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/08/1996Mandate Issued
11/21/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/08/1995Submitted
02/08/1995Submission
01/12/1995Submission
07/29/1994Brief Filed
07/29/1994Case ready to be set
07/05/1994Brief Filed
06/08/1994Do not use
06/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1996Case StoredCase stored
09/30/2000Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sanderson, Harold D.AppellantHarold D. Sanderson
Fowler, James D. And William RAppelleeJulie H. Roberson
Mark T. Davenport
Trial Court Information
108th District Court
Potter
Honorable Abe Lopez
78,254-E