judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0639-94
PD-0639-94
06/08/1994
PDR Case Type
LANDRY, CHRISTOPHER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/11/1994RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/07/1994FINAL DISPRefused
09/21/1994PDR DISPRefused
09/21/1994PDR DISPRefused
07/11/1994RESPONSE FILED
06/08/1994PDR FILED
06/08/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/14/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
LANDRY, CHRISTOPHERApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Jimmy Parks
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-92-01257-CR
AFF 5-12-94
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
637871