judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00575-CV
14-94-00575-CV
06/08/1994
Mandamus/prohibition
Dow Corning Corporation, Et Al
Bianchi, Richard, Judge of 333 District Court, Harris County
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/28/2011Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/23/1994Opinion issuedDENIED
06/23/1994Opinion issuedDENIED
06/22/1994Submitted
06/22/1994Submission
06/22/1994Submitted
06/20/1994Amicus Curiae brief received
06/20/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus DISPOSED-APP,REL,RESDENIED
06/14/1994Exhibits received
06/09/1994Court's request for a response
06/09/1994Court's request for a response
06/08/1994Exhibits received
06/08/1994Mtn.Lv.file writ of mandamus FILED-APP,REL,RES
06/08/1994Petition for Writ of mandamus RECEIVED - REL
06/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/23/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorRichard A. Sheehy
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentSpencer G. Markle
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentJudge, 333rd District Court
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentRichard L. Josephson
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRespondentRichard Warren Mithoff
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationRelatorWilliam J. Stradley
Trial Court Information
333rd District Court
Harris
92-16550