judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00277-CR
02-94-00277-CR
06/08/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Guerra, Jr., Erasmo
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/1995Mandate Issued
08/24/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/23/1995Submitted
05/23/1995Submission
05/03/1995Submission
04/11/1995Brief Filed
04/11/1995Case ready to be set
03/15/1995Brief Filed
03/15/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/17/1995No Description Available.
01/10/1995Order EnteredAbated
12/27/1994Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
07/05/1994Submission
07/05/1994Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
07/05/1994No Description Available.
06/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
06/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Guerra, Jr., ErasmoCriminal - AppellantJim H. Shaw
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Tarrant
Honorable Don Leonard, Criminal District Court No. 3
0421747D
8 YRS IDTDCJ