judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00258-CR
02-94-00258-CR
06/08/1994
All Misdemeanors
Spurlock, Brenda
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/28/1996Order Entered
03/25/1996Mandate Issued
02/08/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/05/1996Exhibits Filed
12/29/1995Order Entered
12/12/1995Submitted
12/12/1995Submission
11/28/1995Brief Filed
11/28/1995Case ready to be set
10/12/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/09/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
06/07/1995Brief Filed
06/07/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/02/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/22/1994Submission
12/15/1994No Description Available.
11/21/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/17/1994No Description Available.
10/18/1994No Description Available.
10/18/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/13/1994No Description Available.
09/01/1994Motion to Consolidate Cases DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/11/1994Response Filed
08/10/1994Motion Filed
08/09/1994Response Filed
08/01/1994Motion to Consolidate Cases Filed
07/13/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
07/11/1994No Description Available.
07/05/1994No Description Available.
06/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
06/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/25/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Spurlock, BrendaCriminal - AppellantBryan K. Buchanan
Glen W. Wood
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 10
Tarrant
Honorable James K. Walker
0518389
35 days Jail & $750 fine