judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00913-CR
05-94-00913-CR
06/08/1994
Felony DWI
Texas, The State of
Charles Eugene Subke
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/21/1996Case stored
02/21/1996Mandate Issued
02/21/1996Mandate Issued
02/10/1996Mandate due to be issued
12/12/1995Case Returned from Higher Ct.
11/01/1995MattConv
10/03/1995Motion to Publish Opinion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/03/1995Opinion Withdrawn
10/03/1995Substitute OpinionAffirmed
10/03/1995Substitute OpinionAffirmed
10/02/1995Record Shipped
09/19/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
09/08/1995Response to Motion
08/29/1995Motion to Publish Opinion
08/23/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/23/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOtherwise Disposed
08/23/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/23/1995Opinion Withdrawn
08/23/1995Motion for Rehearing Granted
12/21/1994Response to Motion
12/14/1994Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/30/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/30/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/25/1994Submission
10/25/1994Submitted
10/25/1994Submission
10/25/1994Submitted
09/15/1994Letter Filed
09/09/1994MattConv
08/23/1994Brief Filed
08/23/1994Case ready to be set
08/23/1994Case ready to be set
07/26/1994Brief Filed
07/07/1994Statement of Facts Filed
06/27/1994Transcript Filed
06/08/1994Notice Sent
06/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/18/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
05/10/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/21/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Collin
Honorable Jerry C. Lewis
2-83764-93
Motion to Suppress Granted