judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00270-CR
02-94-00270-CR
06/08/1994
Robbery
Williams, Alex Ramon
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/08/1996Mandate Issued
11/09/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/10/1995Submitted
10/10/1995Submission
07/05/1995Brief Filed
07/05/1995Case ready to be set
02/24/1995Brief Filed
10/17/1994Submission
09/01/1994Submission
08/29/1994Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
06/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
06/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Williams, Alex RamonCriminal - AppellantMary B. Thornton
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Trial Court Information
213th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Robert K. Gill
0484238A
60 YRS IDTDCJ