judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00275-CR
02-94-00275-CR
06/08/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Castoreno, Carlos Vasquez a/k/a Carlos Vasques Castoreno
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/27/1996Mandate Issued
09/06/1996Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/09/1996Motion Filed
08/08/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/08/1996Submitted
08/08/1996Submission
10/16/1995Letter Brief Filed
10/02/1995Brief Filed
10/02/1995Case ready to be set
09/18/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/15/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
04/28/1995Brief Filed
11/09/1994No Description Available.
11/09/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/09/1994Submission
11/08/1994No Description Available.
09/23/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/21/1994No Description Available.
09/16/1994No Description Available.
06/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
06/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/27/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Castoreno, Carlos VasquezCriminal - AppellantPatrick A. Myers
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasCharles M. Mallin
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Tarrant
Honorable Virgil Vahlenkamp
0517381A
25 YRS IDTDCJ & $5000 FINE